This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/18/2020 at 04:26:12 (UTC).

MIN DUAN VS BETHEL BDG INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 MIN DUAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BETHEL BDG INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5083

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DUAN MIN

Defendants

CHEN DAN

BETHEL BDG INC.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

1/15/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

1/15/2020: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for CIV278,CIV279,CIV280

7/29/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for CIV278,CIV279,CIV280

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473)) of 08/18/2020

8/18/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473)) of 08/18/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473))

8/18/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473))

Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

4/20/2020: Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

4/21/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473))]

3/18/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473))]

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473))

3/25/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473))

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

1/10/2020: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

1/13/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/15/2020, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

1/15/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/15/2020, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration - Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration

1/31/2020: Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration - Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

1/31/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]

2/3/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

12/6/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2021
  • Hearing01/06/2021 at 01:30 PM in Department A at 300 East Walnut St., Pasadena, CA 91101; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims): Result: Vacated; Result Date: 08/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration: Filed By: Dan Chen (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 08/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/06/2021 at 01:30 PM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Min Duan on 12/06/2019, judgment entered on 01/15/2020 is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Min Duan on 12/06/2019, judgment entered on 01/15/2020 as to Bethel BDG Inc. is

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Min Duan on 12/06/2019, judgment entered on 01/15/2020 as to Dan Chen is

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473)) of 08/18/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473) scheduled for 08/18/2020 at 01:30 PM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 08/18/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/15/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 01/15/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Min Duan against Defendant Bethel BDG Inc. and Defendant Dan Chen on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Min Duan on 12/06/2019 for the principal amount of $10,000.00 and costs of $75.00 for a total of $10,075.00, joint and several.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/15/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/13/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A Held - Continued was rescheduled to 01/15/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Min Duan (Plaintiff); As to: Dan Chen (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 12/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Min Duan (Plaintiff); As to: Bethel BDG Inc. (Defendant); Dan Chen (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase assigned in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/13/2020 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less