This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/14/2020 at 18:05:08 (UTC).

MIMI KIM VS ILAN ASHERIAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/21/2018 MIMI KIM filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ILAN ASHERIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENJI MACHIDA. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1929

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KENJI MACHIDA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KIM MIMI DBA KNITOPIA

Los Angeles, CA 90023

Defendants

ASHERIAN ILAN

Los Angeles, CA 90014

CA TRADING INC.

1536 Gage Rd.,

Montebello, CA 90640

A TO Z TEXTILES INC.

846 S. San Pedro St.

Los Angeles, CA 90014

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

PRINCE DAVID L.

1912 E Vernon Ave # 100,

Los Angeles, CA 90058

 

Court Documents

Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment - Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment

5/1/2018: Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment - Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

6/4/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

6/4/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

6/4/2018: Minute Order - (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

6/4/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Substitution of Attorney

5/1/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal

5/1/2018: Notice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal

Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)

7/10/2018: Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]

7/12/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]

Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

7/10/2018: Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

7/10/2018: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)

6/27/2018: Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - [Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]

6/28/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - [Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

4/16/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

4/16/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

3/15/2018: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/6/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/6/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: Mimi Kim (Plaintiff); As to: A To Z Textiles, INC. (Defendant); Interest: 9.19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles); Filed by: County: Los Angeles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (Los Angeles): Status changed from Filed to Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketOrder on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims); Filed by: As to: Ilan Asherian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketRequest to Make Payments (Small Claims); Filed by: A To Z Textiles, INC. (Defendant); As to: Mimi Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: A To Z Textiles, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: CA Trading INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Mimi Kim DBA Knitopia against Defendant A To Z Textiles, INC. on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Mimi Kim on 02/21/2018 for the principal amount of $6,000.00 and costs of $195.00 for a total of $6,195.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: CA Trading INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: A To Z Textiles, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party; As to: CA Trading INC. (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party; As to: CA Trading INC. (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/08/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Non-Party; As to: A To Z Textiles, INC. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/28/18; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Non-Party; As to: Ilan Asherian (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/28/18; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Mimi Kim (Plaintiff); As to: Ilan Asherian (Defendant); A To Z Textiles, INC. (Defendant); CA Trading INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Kenji Machida in Department 1A Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/16/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A TO Z TEXTILES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRINCE DAVID LOUIS