This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 at 13:41:08 (UTC).

MIKISHA K FYKES VS ROBIN A WILLIS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/22/2017 MIKISHA K FYKES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ROBIN A WILLIS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2282

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FYKES MIKISHA K

Inglewood, CA 90305

Defendants

WILLIS TIFFANY AKA TIFFANY JOHNSON

Los Angeles, CA 90043

WILLIS ROBIN A

Los Angeles, CA 90043

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

3/22/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/22/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

3/22/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Unknown

9/27/2017: Unknown

[Request for Court Order and Answer]

9/27/2017: [Request for Court Order and Answer]

Unknown

8/28/2017: Unknown

Unknown

8/1/2017: Unknown

Unknown

7/26/2017: Unknown

[Request to Pay Judgment to Court]

7/26/2017: [Request to Pay Judgment to Court]

Minute Order of 05/19/2017

5/19/2017: Minute Order of 05/19/2017

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

5/19/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/11/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2017
  • Request for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: Mikisha K Fykes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Mikisha K Fykes (Plaintiff); As to: Robin A Willis (Defendant); Tiffany Willis (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 08/28/2017 ; Status Date changed from 07/21/2017 to 08/28/2017 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 08/28/2017 ; Status Date changed from 08/28/2017 to 08/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds; Filed by: Mikisha K Fykes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Request to Pay Judgment to Court; Filed by: Robin A Willis (Defendant); Tiffany Willis (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Pay Judgment to Court]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Result Date changed from 05/19/2017 to 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 04/03/2017
  • Payment: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Amount: $10.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0011406 (Credit Card)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • Invoice: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Fee: $10.00; Balance: $10.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims <= $1,500: Filing for $1,500 or less- CCP 116.230(b)(1); Fee: $30.00; Payment: 30.00 Receipt: 1170322E1495 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170322E1495 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/19/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Mikisha K Fykes (Plaintiff); As to: Robin A Willis (Defendant); Tiffany Willis (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less