This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/02/2020 at 03:00:16 (UTC).

MIKE RUIZ VS EQUITY RESIDNETIAL PROPERTIES, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/07/2020 MIKE RUIZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against EQUITY RESIDNETIAL PROPERTIES, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1629

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RUIZ MIKE

Defendant

EQUITY RESIDNETIAL PROPERTIES LLC

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Attachment]

7/20/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Attachment]

Attachment - Attachment

7/20/2020: Attachment - Attachment

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

9/30/2020: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

9/30/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

4/7/2020: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

4/7/2020: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

5/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

5/9/2020: Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

5/13/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

6/5/2020: Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

6/10/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

4/7/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

4/7/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court), Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

4/7/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court), Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2020
  • Hearing12/18/2020 at 10:00 AM in Department 1 at 10025 East Flower Street, Bellflower, CA 90706; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/30/2020 at 10:00 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 12/18/2020 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketAttachment; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Attachment]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/10/2020 at 01:30 PM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 09/30/2020 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2020
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 07/10/2020 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from EQUITY RESIDNETIAL PROPERTIES, LLC (Defendant) to EQUITY RESIDNETIAL PROPERTIES, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court), Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: MIKE RUIZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: MIKE RUIZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: MIKE RUIZ (Plaintiff); As to: EQUITY RESIDNETIAL PROPERTIES, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less