This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/07/2020 at 07:28:24 (UTC).

MIKAIL KHASHAN VS WILMER BELTRAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/31/2019 MIKAIL KHASHAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WILMER BELTRAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7057

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KHASHAN MIKAIL

Defendants

BELTRAN WILMER

MUFG UNION BANK N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GERGES MOTAZ M

GERGES MOTAZ M.

Defendant Attorney

BEEBE TOD V

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

7/13/2020: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

7/13/2020: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/20/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/21/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/21/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Order Continuing Plaintiff's Demurrers Without Motion to Strike

4/30/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Order Continuing Plaintiff's Demurrers Without Motion to Strike

Reply (name extension) - Reply to Defendants' "Two" Oppositions to Plaintiff's Single Demurrer to First Amended Answer

1/15/2020: Reply (name extension) - Reply to Defendants' "Two" Oppositions to Plaintiff's Single Demurrer to First Amended Answer

Opposition (name extension) - Opposition of Union Bank and Wuilmer Beltran to Demurrer of Plaintiff to First Amended Answer; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof

12/31/2019: Opposition (name extension) - Opposition of Union Bank and Wuilmer Beltran to Demurrer of Plaintiff to First Amended Answer; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof

Opposition (name extension) - Opposition of Union Bank and Wuilmer Beltran to Demurrer of Plaintiff to First Amended Answer: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof

12/17/2019: Opposition (name extension) - Opposition of Union Bank and Wuilmer Beltran to Demurrer of Plaintiff to First Amended Answer: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Intent to File an Opposition to Defendants' Untimely Motion Seeking Order Directing Arbitration

12/5/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Intent to File an Opposition to Defendants' Untimely Motion Seeking Order Directing Arbitration

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

11/25/2019: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

10/24/2019: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Answer - Answer

10/29/2019: Answer - Answer

Complaint - Complaint

7/31/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/31/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/31/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

7/31/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/31/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2020
  • Hearing11/12/2020 at 09:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: Mikail Khashan (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No; Settlement Type: Unconditional; Set Hearing and Generate Notice?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Settlement: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 11/12/2020 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/03/2022 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration scheduled for 08/05/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for 08/05/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Order Continuing Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by: Mikail Khashan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Mikail Khashan (Plaintiff); As to: MUFG Union Bank, N.A. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/20/2019; Service Cost: 59.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Mikail Khashan (Plaintiff); As to: Wilmer Beltran (Defendant); Service Date: 09/23/2019; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Mikail Khashan (Plaintiff); As to: Wilmer Beltran (Defendant); MUFG Union Bank, N.A. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Mikail Khashan (Plaintiff); As to: Wilmer Beltran (Defendant); MUFG Union Bank, N.A. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Mikail Khashan (Plaintiff); As to: Wilmer Beltran (Defendant); MUFG Union Bank, N.A. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC07057    Hearing Date: January 23, 2020    Dept: 26

Khashan v. Beltran, et al.

DEMURRER

(CCP §§ 430.31, et seq.)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Mikail Khashan’s Demurrer to the First Amended Answer is CONTINUED TO JUNE 11, 2020 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 26 IN THE SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. NO FURTHER BRIEFING PERMITTED.

ANALYSIS:

On July 31, 2019, Plaintiff Mikail Kashan (“Plaintiff”) filed the instant action for breach of contract

and fraud against Defendants MUFG Union Bank, N.A. And Wuilmer Beltran (erroneously sued as Wilmer Beltran) (“Defendants”). On October 24, 2019, Defendants filed an Answer, and then filed a First Amended Answer on October 29, 2019. On November 25, 2019, Plaintiff filed the instant Demurrer to the First Amended Answer. Soon thereafter, on December 2, 2019, Defendants filed a motion to compel arbitration, which is set to be heard on June 3, 2020. Plaintiff filed a notice of intent to oppose the motion to compel arbitration on December 5, 2019 and to move for sanctions under Code of Civil Procedure section 128.7. Defendants filed two virtually identical oppositions to the Demurrer on December 17 and 31, 2019 and Plaintiff replied on January 15, 2020.

In light of the hearing on the motion to compel arbitration scheduled for June 3, 2020, the Court continues the hearing on the instant Demurrer until after it has ruled on the matter of arbitration. The Demurrer is CONTINUED TO JUNE 11, 2020 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 26 IN THE SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. NO FURTHER BRIEFING PERMITTED.

Moving party to give notice.