This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/23/2021 at 01:12:21 (UTC).

MIGUEL ANGEL ROBLES, ET AL. VS JEYSON CARRANZA

Case Summary

On 06/14/2018 MIGUEL ANGEL ROBLES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JEYSON CARRANZA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8433

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DE LA CRUZ VICENTE

ROBLES MIGUEL ANGEL

Defendant

CARRANZA JEYSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AHN PAUL S

Defendant Attorney

GARCIA JEFFREY EMANUEL

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

9/20/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice (name extension) - Notice OF HEARING

8/23/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice OF HEARING

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

5/5/2020: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/14/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Change of Firm Name - Notice of Change of Firm Name

11/4/2020: Notice of Change of Firm Name - Notice of Change of Firm Name

Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF VICENTE DE LA CRUZ'S VERIFIFED RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORIT

11/23/2020: Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF VICENTE DE LA CRUZ'S VERIFIFED RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORIT

Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF VICENTE DE LA CRUZ'S VERIFIED RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS;MEMO OF POINTS AND AU

11/23/2020: Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF VICENTE DE LA CRUZ'S VERIFIED RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS;MEMO OF POINTS AND AU

Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF VICENTE DE LA CRUZ'S VERIFFIED RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES;MEMO OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES;

11/23/2020: Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF VICENTE DE LA CRUZ'S VERIFFIED RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES;MEMO OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES;

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)

1/27/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

3/5/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

3/5/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Compliance Re Sanctions

3/5/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Compliance Re Sanctions

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

3/30/2021: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

3/30/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/12/2019

12/12/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/12/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/12/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/14/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 09/23/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Miguel Angel Robles, et al. on 06/14/2018, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Miguel Angel Robles and Vicente De La Cruz as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketNotice OF HEARING; Filed by: Jeyson Carranza (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 09/23/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of defendant, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 08/02/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 09/23/2021 09:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: Miguel Angel Robles (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No; Settlement Type: Unconditional; Set Hearing and Generate Notice?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Settlement: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 08/02/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/12/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 12/12/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 94 - Hon. James E. Blancarte; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Miguel Angel Robles (Plaintiff); Vicente De La Cruz (Plaintiff); As to: Jeyson Carranza (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 07/01/18; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Miguel Angel Robles (Plaintiff); Vicente De La Cruz (Plaintiff); As to: Jeyson Carranza (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Miguel Angel Robles (Plaintiff); Vicente De La Cruz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/12/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STLC08433    Hearing Date: January 27, 2021    Dept: 25

HEARING DATE: Wed., January 27, 2021 JUDGE /DEPT: Blancarte/25

CASE NAME: Robles, et al v. Carranza COMP. FILED: 06-14-18

CASE NUMBER: 18STLC08433 DISC. C/O: NONE

NOTICE: OK DISC. MOT. C/O: NONE

TRIAL DATE: NOT SET

PROCEEDINGS: (1) MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF MIGUEL ANGEL ROBLES’ VERIFIED RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

(2) MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF MIGUEL ANGEL ROBLES’ VERIFIED RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

MOVING PARTY: Defendant Jeyson Carranza

RESP. PARTY: None

MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

(CCP § 2030.290)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant Jeyson Carranza’s Motions to Compel Plaintiff Miguel Angel Robles’ Verified Responses to Form and Special Interrogatories, Sets One, are GRANTED. Plaintiff Robles is ordered to provide verified responses without objections within thirty (30) days of this order. Defendant’s requests for monetary sanctions are also GRANTED in the amount of $420.00 to be paid within thirty (30) days of notice of this order.

SERVICE:

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

OPPOSITION: None filed as of January 25, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of January 25, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background

On June 14, 2018, Plaintiffs Miguel Angel Robles (“Robles”) and Vicente De La Cruz (“Cruz”) (collectively, “Plaintiffs”) filed an action for motor vehicle negligence and general negligence against Defendant Jeyson Carranza (“Defendant”). Defendant filed an Answer on May 5, 2020.

On November 23, 2020, Defendant filed the instant (1) Motion to Compel Plaintiff Miguel Angel Robles’ Verified Responses to Form Interrogatories and Request for Monetary Sanctions and (2) Motion to Compel Plaintiff Miguel Angel Robles’ Verified Responses to Special Interrogatories and Request for Monetary Sanctions (collectively, the “Motions”). To date, no opposition has been filed.

  1. Legal Standard & Discussion

  1. Form Interrogatories

A party must respond to interrogatories within 30 days after service. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2030.260, subd. (a).) If a party to whom interrogatories are directed does not provide timely responses, the requesting party may move for an order compelling responses to the discovery. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2030.290, subd. (b).) The party also waives the right to make any objections, including one based on privilege or work-product protection. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2030.290, subd. (a).) There is no time limit for a motion to compel responses to interrogatories other than the cut-off on hearing discovery motions 15 days before trial. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2024.020, subd. (a); Code Civ. Proc., 2030.290.) No meet and confer efforts are required before filing a motion to compel responses to the discovery. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2030.290; Sinaiko Healthcare Consulting, Inc. v. Pacific Healthcare Consultants (2007) 148 Cal.App.4th 390, 411.)

Here, Defendant served Plaintiff Robles with Form Interrogatories, Set One, and Special Interrogatories, Set One, on June 19, 2020 via e-mail. (Motions, Pak Decl., ¶¶ 2, Exhs. A.) Although not procedurally required, Defendant’s counsel met and conferred with Plaintiff’ Robles’ counsel between July 31, 2020 and November 19, 2020, regarding the lack of verified responses. (Id. at ¶¶ 4 – 8.) As of the date of these Motions, Plaintiff Robles has not provided any verified responses. (Id. at ¶¶ 9.) Thus, Defendant is entitled to an order compelling Plaintiff Robles to provide verified responses to the Form and Special Interrogatories without objections. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2030.290.)

  1. Sanctions

Code of Civil Procedure section 2023.030, subdivision (a) provides, in pertinent part, that the court may impose a monetary sanction on a party engaging in the misuse of the discovery process to pay the reasonable expenses, including attorney’s fees, incurred by anyone as a result of that conduct. A misuse of the discovery process includes failing to respond or submit to an authorized method of discovery. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2023.010, subd. (d).)

The Court finds Plaintiff Robles’ failure to respond to Defendant’s discovery requests a misuse of the discovery process.

Defendant’s counsel requests a total of $870.00 in sanctions, based on six hours of attorney time billed at $125.00 per hour and two filing fees of $60.00. (Mot., Pak Decl., ¶¶ 10.) However, the amount sought is excessive given the simplicity of these nearly identical Motions and the lack of opposition and reply. The Court finds $420.00, based on two hours of attorney time and two filing fees, to be reasonable.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Defendant Jeyson Carranza’s Motions to Compel Plaintiff Miguel Angel Robles’ Verified Responses to Form and Special Interrogatories, Sets One, are GRANTED. Plaintiff Robles is ordered to provide verified responses without objections within thirty (30) days of this order. Defendant’s requests for monetary sanctions are also GRANTED in the amount of $420.00 to be paid within thirty (30) days of notice of this order.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer AHN PAUL S.