This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 02:17:33 (UTC).

MIDWAY RENT A CAR, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS BOG HIE JUNG, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/04/2018 a Contract - Other Contract case was filed by MIDWAY RENT A CAR, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION against BOG HIE JUNG in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6797

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDWAY RENT A CAR INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA MIDWAY CAR RENTAL DBA M CAR DBA MIDWAY HFCA LLC

Defendants

CASTILLO ERIC LEO

JUNG BOG HIE AKA GRACE JUNG AKA BOG LEE

CARDENAS ERNESTO ABDON AKA ERNESTO ABDON CARDENAS CASTRO

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/4/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - on Complaint

5/4/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Complaint

5/4/2018: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

5/30/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/7/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/7/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/19/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

5/28/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/28/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

6/27/2019: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/27/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Judgment - Judgment Judgment

7/22/2019: Judgment - Judgment Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/01/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Midway Rent a Car, Inc a california corporation DBA M Car, DBA Midway Car Rental, DBA Midway HFCA LLC against Defendant Ernesto Abdon Cardenas AKA Ernesto Abdon Cardenas Castro, Defendant Eric Leo Castillo and Defendant Bog Hie Jung AKA Bog Lee, AKA Grace Jung on the Complaint filed by Midway Rent a Car, Inc a california corporation on 05/04/2018 for damages of $8,387.00, attorney fees of $593.22, interest of $1,220.14, and costs of $473.10 for a total of $10,673.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketJudgment Judgment; Signed and Filed by: Midway Rent a Car, Inc a california corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Bog Hie Jung (Defendant); Ernesto Abdon Cardenas (Defendant); Eric Leo Castillo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: Midway Rent a Car, Inc a california corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Midway Rent a Car, Inc a california corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Bog Hie Jung (Defendant); Ernesto Abdon Cardenas (Defendant); Eric Leo Castillo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketDefault entered as to Bog Hie Jung; Ernesto Abdon Cardenas; Eric Leo Castillo; On the Complaint filed by Midway Rent a Car, Inc a california corporation on 05/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Midway Rent a Car, Inc a california corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Bog Hie Jung (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Midway Rent a Car, Inc a california corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketDefault entered as to Bog Hie Jung; On the Complaint filed by Midway Rent a Car, Inc a california corporation on 05/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Midway Rent a Car, Inc a california corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Ernesto Abdon Cardenas (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/04/18; Service Cost: 77.10; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Midway Rent a Car, Inc a california corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Eric Leo Castillo (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/04/18; Service Cost: 72.10; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Midway Rent a Car, Inc a california corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Bog Hie Jung (Defendant); Service Date: 05/21/18; Service Cost: 99.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Midway Rent a Car, Inc a california corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Bog Hie Jung (Defendant); Ernesto Abdon Cardenas (Defendant); Eric Leo Castillo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Midway Rent a Car, Inc a california corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/01/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STLC06797    Hearing Date: January 28, 2020    Dept: 25

MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL

(CCP § 657)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant Bog Hie Jung’s Motion for New Trial is DENIED.

ANALYSIS:

I. Background & Discussion

On May 4, 2018, Plaintiff Midway Rent a Car, Inc. (“Plaintiff”) filed an action for breach of contract, common counts, and general negligence against Defendants Bog Hie Jung aka Bog Lee (“Jung”), Ernesto Abdon Cardenas Castro (“Castro”), and Eric Leo Castillo (“Castillo”) (collectively, “Defendants”). On May 30, 2018, Plaintiff filed a proof of service indicating Jung had been personally served on May 21, 2018. (5/30/18 Proof of Service.)

Default was entered as to Castro and Castillo on July 19, 2018. On May 28, 2019, default was entered against Jung. On July 22, 2018, default judgment was entered against all Defendants in the amount of $10,673.46. (7/22/19 Judgment.)

On December 10, 2019, Jung filed the instant Motion for New Trial (the “Motion”). The Motion consists of a single page, does not cite any authority, and requests that the court “re-open” the case to allow Jung to present her defense. (Mot., p. 1.)

The Court notes that filing a Motion for New Trial is not the proper procedure. Instead, if Jung wishes to re-open her case and present a defense, she must file a motion to set aside/vacate default and default judgment and for leave to defend action under Code of Civil Procedure sections 473 and 473.5. The Court additionally notes any motion filed must also be served on Plaintiff in accordance with Code of Civil Procedure section 1005, subdivision (b).

III. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Defendant Bog Hie Jung’s Motion for New Trial is DENIED.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.