This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/07/2019 at 14:01:17 (UTC).

MIDWAY CAR RENTAL, INC VS SHAWN JONATHEN HARRIETT

Case Summary

On 06/23/2016 MIDWAY CAR RENTAL, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SHAWN JONATHEN HARRIETT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0805

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDWAY CAR RENTAL INC

4751 Wilshire Blvd Suite 120

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Defendant

HARRIETT SHAWN JONATHEN

Rolling Hills, CA 90274

Assignee

TRACO INVESTMENT CORP. A DELAWARE CORP. DBA TRACORP

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

8/26/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

8/26/2016: Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

8/26/2016: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 08/26/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

8/26/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 08/26/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

8/26/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Assignment of Judgment

8/7/2017: Assignment of Judgment

Appointment of Attorney

8/7/2017: Appointment of Attorney

Proof of Service Not Plaintiffs / Defendants Claim - RE: ASSIGNMENT

8/7/2017: Proof of Service Not Plaintiffs / Defendants Claim - RE: ASSIGNMENT

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

6/23/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Acceptance

6/23/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Acceptance

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

6/23/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

6/23/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/20/2016: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2017
  • Assignment of Judgment; Filed by: TRACO INVESTMENT CORP., A DELAWARE CORP. (Assignee); MIDWAY CAR RENTAL, INC (Plaintiff); As to: Shawn Jonathen Harriett (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Appointment of Attorney; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • Proof of Service Not Plaintiff?s / Defendant?s Claim RE: ASSIGNMENT; Filed by: As to: Shawn Jonathen Harriett (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 08/26/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/26/2016 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 08/26/2016; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff MIDWAY CAR RENTAL, INC against Defendant Shawn Jonathen Harriett on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by MIDWAY CAR RENTAL, INC on 06/23/2016 for the principal amount of $1,036.66 and costs of $80.00 for a total of $1,116.66.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: MIDWAY CAR RENTAL, INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: MIDWAY CAR RENTAL, INC (Plaintiff); As to: Shawn Jonathen Harriett (Defendant); Proof Of Mailing: Yes; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: 1160624E5671 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2016
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1160624E5671 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/26/2016 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: MIDWAY CAR RENTAL, INC (Plaintiff); As to: Shawn Jonathen Harriett (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Acceptance; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.