This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 at 13:41:37 (UTC).

MIDWAY CAR RENTAL, INC VS KIARRA WOODWARD

Case Summary

On 03/22/2017 MIDWAY CAR RENTAL, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KIARRA WOODWARD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2292

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDWAY CAR RENTAL INC

4751 Wilshire Blvd Suite 120

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Defendants

WOODWARD KIARRA

Los Angeles, CA 90003

KNAUTH DEVON

Assignee

TRACO INVESTMENT CORP. A DELAWARE CORP DBA TRACORP

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

3/24/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

3/22/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

3/22/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Unknown

8/10/2017: Unknown

RE: ASSIGNMENT

8/10/2017: RE: ASSIGNMENT

Unknown

8/10/2017: Unknown

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

5/19/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

5/19/2017: Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

5/19/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order of 05/19/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

5/19/2017: Minute Order of 05/19/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

5/19/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

4/20/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2017
  • Assignment of Judgment; Filed by: TRACO INVESTMENT CORP., A DELAWARE CORP (Assignee); MIDWAY CAR RENTAL, INC (Plaintiff); As to: Kiarra Woodward (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • Appointment of Attorney; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • Proof of Service Not Plaintiff?s / Defendant?s Claim RE: ASSIGNMENT; Filed by: As to: Kiarra Woodward (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 05/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/19/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/19/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 05/19/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff MIDWAY CAR RENTAL, INC against Defendant Kiarra Woodward on the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by MIDWAY CAR RENTAL, INC on 03/24/2017 for the principal amount of $607.15 and costs of $80.00 for a total of $687.15.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/24/2017
  • ** Case Name changed from MIDWAY CAR RENTAL, INC vs DEVON KNAUTH to MIDWAY CAR RENTAL, INC vs KIARRA WOODWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: MIDWAY CAR RENTAL, INC (Plaintiff); As to: Kiarra Woodward (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: 1170322E0140 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170322E0140 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/19/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: MIDWAY CAR RENTAL, INC (Plaintiff); As to: Devon Knauth (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less