This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/12/2022 at 12:10:42 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS SHIM, DARRYL

Case Summary

On 07/12/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SHIM, DARRYL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VALERIE SALKIN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2405

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

VALERIE SALKIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

SHIM DARRYL AKA SHIM DARRYL S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SNYDER DAVID B.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/24/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

11/14/2017: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Settlement

11/9/2017: Notice of Settlement

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

3/7/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date scheduled for 06/17/2019 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Stay - Conditional Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: (MIDLAND FUNDING LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by MIDLAND FUNDING LLC on 07/12/2017, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by (MIDLAND FUNDING LLC) as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date scheduled for 06/17/2019 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing Other scheduled for 06/26/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Conditional Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: (MIDLAND FUNDING LLC) (Plaintiff); Settlement Type: Conditional; OSC re: Dismissal Date: 06/17/2019; Vacate Future Dates: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: (MIDLAND FUNDING LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: DARRYL SHIM (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/21/2017; Service Cost: 68.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketOSC HEARING IS SET FOR 06/26/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT F43 . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY VALERIE SALKIN TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO RECORDS RE: FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN CHA538853037. Filing Fee: 181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION UNDER BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONS CODE 6322.1 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SNYDER, DAVID B.