Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/26/2020 at 03:14:51 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS ROLAND LONGORIA

Case Summary

On 09/19/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ROLAND LONGORIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7133

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

LONGORIA ROLAND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRIGORYAN MELINE

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/22/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

9/19/2019: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

9/19/2019: Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration RE: Code of Civil Procedure 1033; Interest; and Evidence Code 1550

1/22/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration RE: Code of Civil Procedure 1033; Interest; and Evidence Code 1550

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

1/22/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

9/23/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Exhibits in Support of Judgment

1/22/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Exhibits in Support of Judgment

Complaint - Complaint

9/19/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/19/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/19/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • Hearing09/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Midland Funding LLC on 09/19/2019, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Midland Funding LLC, does 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: ROLAND LONGORIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration RE: Code of Civil Procedure 1033; Interest; and Evidence Code 1550; Filed by: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Exhibits in Support of Judgment; Filed by: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to ROLAND LONGORIA; On the Complaint filed by Midland Funding LLC on 09/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: ROLAND LONGORIA (Defendant); Service Date: 09/21/2019; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: ROLAND LONGORIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: ROLAND LONGORIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1); Filed by: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: ROLAND LONGORIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: ROLAND LONGORIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less