This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/17/2019 at 01:17:35 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS RODRIGUEZ, CANY Y

Case Summary

On 12/16/2015 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RODRIGUEZ, CANY Y. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DANIEL P RAMIREZ and THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8401

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judges

DANIEL P RAMIREZ

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

RODRIGUEZ CANY Y

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HUNT & HENRIQUES, ATTORNEY AT LAW - ANASTASIA M LOLONG

Attorney at HUNT & HENRIQUES, ATTORNEY AT LAW

LOLONG ANASTASIA M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2016
  • ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT SIGNED BY THOMAS D. LONG, JUDGE AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING IS VACATED, NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT HAVING BEEN FILED, CASE SET FOR OSC TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SIGNED AND FILED BY THOMAS D. LONG, JUDGE . MATTER SET ON 04/12/21 AT 08:30A M. IN DEPT. SEY . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT SEY FOR CONSIDERATION RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6, MT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY (MIDLAND FUNDING LLC) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • STIPULATION RE: CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED. RECEIPT # NOR453226005 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (RODRIGUEZ, CANY Y) SUBSERVED BY LEAVING WITH MANUEL JIMENEZ ON 01/17/16 . COSTS OF $ 59.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • OSC HEARING IS SET FOR 11/30/18 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEY . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY DANIEL P RAMIREZ, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR455965042. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less