This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/11/2022 at 05:23:48 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS PHILLIPS, KARI

Case Summary

On 07/10/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PHILLIPS, KARI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VALERIE SALKIN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3192

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

VALERIE SALKIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

PHILLIPS KARI AKA PHILLIPS KARI L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ATTORNEY AT LAW - DAVID B. SNYDER

SNYDER DAVID B.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service - No Service

8/7/2017: Proof of Service - No Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

6/30/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/4/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

7/13/2017: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/10/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Under Business and Professions Code 6322.1

7/10/2017: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Under Business and Professions Code 6322.1

Complaint - Complaint

7/10/2017: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons

7/10/2017: Summons - Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing Other scheduled for 08/12/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by (MIDLAND FUNDING LLC) on 07/10/2017, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by (MIDLAND FUNDING LLC) as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause - Hearing Other scheduled for 06/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 08/12/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DocketOSC HEARING IS SET FOR 06/24/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT F43 . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY VALERIE SALKIN TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: (MIDLAND FUNDING LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION UNDER BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONS CODE 6322.1 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN CHA538853094. Filing Fee: 181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SNYDER, DAVID B.