This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/12/2022 at 06:24:54 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS NIMOCKS, TARA

Case Summary

On 07/10/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NIMOCKS, TARA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VALERIE SALKIN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3185

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

VALERIE SALKIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

NIMOCKS TARA AKA NIMOCKS TARA J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ATTORNEY AT LAW - DAVID B. SNYDER

SNYDER DAVID B.

 

Court Documents

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

3/15/2019: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

4/5/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Judgment

4/2/2018: Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/9/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - CCP 1033

2/9/2018: Declaration (name extension) - CCP 1033

Request for Dismissal

2/9/2018: Request for Dismissal

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

2/9/2018: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/1/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service - No Service

8/21/2017: Proof of Service - No Service

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

6/5/2020: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Writ - Return - Writ - Return

5/26/2020: Writ - Return - Writ - Return

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

12/4/2019: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

11/19/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

11/19/2019: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 92 on [ln 37, col 39] with Document:77576486

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 06/08/2020 ; Status Date changed from 04/02/2018 to 06/08/2020 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: (MIDLAND FUNDING LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: TARA NIMOCKS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 92 on [ln 8, col 47] with Document:74956718

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Partially Satisfied); Clerk; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 25.00; Principal Credits: 3,030.75; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Partially Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: (MIDLAND FUNDING LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: TARA NIMOCKS (Defendant); County: LOS ANGELES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned to Chatsworth Courthouse in Department F43 - Hon. Robert Schuit; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketAddress for DAVID B. SNYDER (Attorney) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: DAVID B. SNYDER (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: (MIDLAND FUNDING LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: TARA NIMOCKS (Defendant); Costs: 25.00; Interest: 0.00; Credits: 0.00; Service Date: 11/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketDefault entered as to TARA NIMOCKS; On the Complaint filed by MIDLAND FUNDING LLC on 07/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: (MIDLAND FUNDING LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketDeclaration CCP 1033; Filed by: (MIDLAND FUNDING LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: (MIDLAND FUNDING LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: TARA NIMOCKS (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/25/2017; Service Cost: 68.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DocketOSC HEARING IS SET FOR 06/24/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT F43 . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY VALERIE SALKIN TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION UNDER BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONS CODE 6322.1 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN CHA538853087. Filing Fee: 181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SNYDER, DAVID B.