Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2020 at 15:45:04 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS MARK SLEEPER, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 09/19/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARK SLEEPER, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDY RHODES. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7344

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RANDY RHODES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

SLEEPER AN INDIVIDUAL MARK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIDUGUEN CHRISTINE S.

 

Court Documents

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: NOTICE PURSUANT TO C.C .P . 1033

12/19/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: NOTICE PURSUANT TO C.C .P . 1033

Declaration re: Attorney's Fees - Declaration re: Attorney's Fees

12/19/2019: Declaration re: Attorney's Fees - Declaration re: Attorney's Fees

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/19/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: Copies Documents in lieu of original

12/19/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: Copies Documents in lieu of original

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: 1788.60

12/19/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: 1788.60

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

12/19/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

12/26/2019: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

9/30/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Venue

9/19/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Venue

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

9/19/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/19/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

9/19/2019: Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/19/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

9/19/2019: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff MIDLAND FUNDING LLC against Defendant MARK SLEEPER, an Individual on the Complaint filed by MIDLAND FUNDING LLC on 09/19/2019 for damages of $2,105.24 and costs of $276.00 for a total of $2,381.24.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment: Status Date changed from 12/26/2019 to 12/26/2019; Result Date changed from 12/26/2019 to 12/26/2019; As To Parties changed from MARK SLEEPER, an Individual (Defendant) to MARK SLEEPER, an Individual (Defendant); Status changed from Filed to Signed and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC (Plaintiff); As to: MARK SLEEPER, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC (Plaintiff); As to: MARK SLEEPER, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketDeclaration re: Attorney's Fees; Filed by: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketDeclaration Re: Copies Documents in lieu of original; Filed by: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketDeclaration Re: NOTICE PURSUANT TO C.C .P . 1033; Filed by: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketDeclaration Re: 1788.60; Filed by: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketDefault entered as to MARK SLEEPER, an Individual; On the Complaint filed by MIDLAND FUNDING LLC on 09/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Randy Rhodes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC (Plaintiff); As to: MARK SLEEPER, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC (Plaintiff); As to: MARK SLEEPER, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1); Filed by: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC (Plaintiff); As to: MARK SLEEPER, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration of Venue; Filed by: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC (Plaintiff); As to: MARK SLEEPER, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MIDLAND FUNDING LLC (Plaintiff); As to: MARK SLEEPER, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less