This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/04/2022 at 06:41:34 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS MARIA BOLANOS

Case Summary

On 07/05/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARIA BOLANOS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT SCHUIT. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5421

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT SCHUIT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

BOLANOS MARIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRAVES MISHAELA J

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

7/5/2019: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/5/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/5/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/5/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

7/5/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

7/29/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/8/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/12/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration 1033

4/12/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration 1033

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

4/12/2021: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

4/12/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

4/12/2021: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: MARIA BOLANOS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDeclaration 1033; Filed by: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to MARIA BOLANOS; On the Complaint filed by Midland Funding LLC on 07/05/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Midland Funding LLC on 07/05/2019, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Midland Funding LLC, does 1-10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Midland Funding LLC against Defendant MARIA BOLANOS on the Complaint filed by Midland Funding LLC on 07/05/2019 for the principal amount of $6,349.95 and damages of $315.90 for a total of $6,665.85.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment: Status Date changed from 04/12/2021 to 04/12/2021; Result Date changed from 04/12/2021 to 04/12/2021; As To Parties changed from MARIA BOLANOS (Defendant) to MARIA BOLANOS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment: Filed By: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 04/12/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 07/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 03/04/2022 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: MARIA BOLANOS (Defendant); Service Date: 07/27/2019; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 07/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Robert Schuit in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: MARIA BOLANOS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: MARIA BOLANOS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: MARIA BOLANOS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MISHAELA J GRAVES