This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/09/2022 at 13:42:27 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS MANDUJANO, MARIA

Case Summary

On 07/10/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MANDUJANO, MARIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VALERIE SALKIN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3186

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

VALERIE SALKIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

MANDUJANO MARIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ATTORNEY AT LAW - DAVID B. SNYDER

SNYDER DAVID B.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

10/26/2017: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service - No Service

8/8/2017: Proof of Service - No Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Case Destroyed pursuant to California Government Code Section 68151 and 68153.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • DocketRequest for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: (MIDLAND FUNDING LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing (name extension) scheduled for 06/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION RE: NON SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DocketOSC HEARING IS SET FOR 06/24/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT F43 . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY VALERIE SALKIN TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN CHA538853088. Filing Fee: 181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION UNDER BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONS CODE 6322.1 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SNYDER, DAVID B.