Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2019 at 17:45:58 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS HERNANDEZ, EZEQUIEL

Case Summary

On 03/29/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HERNANDEZ, EZEQUIEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6630

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

HERNANDEZ EZEQUIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ATTORNEY AT LAW - MISHAELA J GRAVES

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

DE GUZMAN NICHOL ALAN S.

 

Court Documents

Disassociation of Attorney

9/12/2017: Disassociation of Attorney

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2017
  • Disassociation of Attorney; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; GENERAL ORDER RETURNED NOT FOUND/NO SERVICE AS TO (HERNANDEZ, EZEQUIEL) FILED. COSTS OF $ 68.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • OSC HEARING IS SET FOR 03/13/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEB . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY THOMAS D. LONG, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR455371108. Filing Fee: 181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONS CODE 6322.1 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MISHAELA J GRAVES

Latest cases represented by Lawyer De Guzman, Nichol Alan S