This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/18/2022 at 05:56:40 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS HAWKINS, ANTHIA

Case Summary

On 07/10/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HAWKINS, ANTHIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VALERIE SALKIN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3188

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

VALERIE SALKIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

HAWKINS ANTHIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ATTORNEY AT LAW - DAVID B. SNYDER

SNYDER DAVID B.

 

Court Documents

Writ - Return - Writ - Return

4/5/2019: Writ - Return - Writ - Return

Judgment

2/27/2018: Judgment

Request for Dismissal

1/29/2018: Request for Dismissal

Declaration (name extension) - CCP 1033; INTEREST; EVIDENCE CODE 1550

1/29/2018: Declaration (name extension) - CCP 1033; INTEREST; EVIDENCE CODE 1550

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

1/29/2018: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/29/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/29/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service - No Service

9/13/2017: Proof of Service - No Service

Proof of Service - No Service

8/22/2017: Proof of Service - No Service

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

6/5/2020: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 92 on [ln 37, col 39] with Document:77576391

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 06/08/2020 ; Status Date changed from 02/27/2018 to 06/08/2020 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: (MIDLAND FUNDING LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: ANTHIA HAWKINS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (SACRAMENTO): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 04/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Partially Satisfied);; Costs Credits: 65.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 2,009.33; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Partially Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution (SACRAMENTO); Issued by: Clerk; County: SACRAMENTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing Other scheduled for 06/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketDefault judgment entered for Plaintiff (MIDLAND FUNDING LLC) against Defendant (HAWKINS, ANTHIA) on the Complaint filed by MIDLAND FUNDING LLC on 07/10/2017 for the principal amount of $1,956.12 and costs of $385.00 for a total of $2,341.12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketEXHIBITS; Filed by: (MIDLAND FUNDING LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by MIDLAND FUNDING LLC on 07/10/2017, Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to , Does 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: (MIDLAND FUNDING LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: (MIDLAND FUNDING LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: ANTHIA HAWKINS (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/25/2017; Service Cost: 68.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DocketOSC HEARING IS SET FOR 06/24/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT F43 . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY VALERIE SALKIN TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN CHA538853090. Filing Fee: 181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketDECLARATION UNDER BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONS CODE 6322.1 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SNYDER, DAVID B.