This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/14/2019 at 15:45:16 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC VS GOMEZ, ANNE

Case Summary

On 06/12/2012 MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GOMEZ, ANNE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, San Pedro Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0743

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Pedro Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

GOMEZ ANNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BROWN, TOMOTHY

BROWN TOMOTHY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2013
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2012
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2012
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2012
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2012
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO DOES 1-10 FILED BY ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF. REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO DOES 1-10 FILED BY ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2012
  • SUBMISSION FOR CLERK'S CIVIL JUDGMENT PENDING*** DEFAULT PROCESSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2012
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • OSC SET 12/17/12, 0830 AM, DEPT. 87, NOTICE FILED & MAILED * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED - COLLECTION CASE Filing Fee: 181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2012
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.