This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/16/2022 at 18:08:30 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS GAUDET, CRAIG

Case Summary

On 07/10/2017 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GAUDET, CRAIG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VALERIE SALKIN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3193

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

VALERIE SALKIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

GAUDET CRAIG AKA GAUDET CRAIG N

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ATTORNEY AT LAW - DAVID B. SNYDER

SNYDER DAVID B.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/10/2017: Complaint

Summons

7/10/2017: Summons

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

7/13/2017: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

7/27/2017: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/10/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Answer

8/21/2017: Answer

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

10/20/2017: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/12/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY

7/19/2018: Declaration (name extension) - IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY

Minute Order - (Non-Appearance Case Review)

8/22/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Appearance Case Review)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 08/22/2017

8/22/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 08/22/2017

Notice (name extension) - of Entry of Order

9/6/2018: Notice (name extension) - of Entry of Order

Judgment

8/22/2018: Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

8/22/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

8/22/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Judgment

8/22/2018: Judgment

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order; Filed by: (MIDLAND FUNDING LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: CRAIG GAUDET (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/22/2018 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 updated: Result Date to 08/22/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff (MIDLAND FUNDING LLC) against Defendant (GAUDET, CRAIG) AKA (GAUDET, CRAIG N) on the Complaint filed by MIDLAND FUNDING LLC on 07/10/2017 for the principal amount of $24,406.62 and costs of $438.00 for a total of $24,844.62.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- On the Complaint filed by MIDLAND FUNDING LLC on 07/10/2017, judgment entered on 08/22/2018 is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by MIDLAND FUNDING LLC on 07/10/2017, judgment entered on 08/22/2018 as to CRAIG GAUDET is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff (MIDLAND FUNDING LLC) against Defendant (GAUDET, CRAIG) AKA (GAUDET, CRAIG N) on the Complaint filed by MIDLAND FUNDING LLC on 07/10/2017 for the principal amount of $24,406.62 and costs of $438.00 for a total of $24,844.62.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/22/2018 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, OSC - Hearing (name extension) scheduled for 06/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in at Department F43 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 08/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: CRAIG GAUDET (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (GAUDET, CRAIG) AKA (GAUDET, CRAIG N) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DocketOSC HEARING IS SET FOR 06/24/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT F43 . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY VALERIE SALKIN TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO RECORDS RE: FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN CHA538853095. Filing Fee: 370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: (MIDLAND FUNDING LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SNYDER, DAVID B.