Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/07/2021 at 02:43:43 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS ANA CABRERA

Case Summary

On 06/05/2020 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ANA CABRERA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4510

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

CABRERA ANA

Azusa, CA 91702

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ARNOLD CHRISTINA

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)

6/11/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/15/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Non-Service

7/1/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Non-Service

Complaint - Complaint

6/5/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/5/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/5/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/5/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

6/5/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • Hearing09/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 06/11/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 09/07/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: ANA CABRERA (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 07/15/2020; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration of Non-Service; Filed by: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 06/11/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lillian Vega Jacobs in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: ANA CABRERA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: ANA CABRERA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Midland Funding LLC (Plaintiff); As to: ANA CABRERA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARNOLD CHRISTINA