This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/04/2019 at 01:46:30 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS AGUIRRE, ADAM N

Case Summary

On 12/16/2015 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AGUIRRE, ADAM N. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL P RAMIREZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8352

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

DANIEL P RAMIREZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

AGUIRRE ADAM N

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HUNT & HENRIQUES, ATTORNEY AT LAW - ANASTASIA M LOLONG

Attorney at HUNT & HENRIQUES, ATTORNEY AT LAW

LOLONG ANASTASIA M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2019
  • Order case file destroyed per section(s) 71008 and/or 68152 of the Government Code. Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (AGUIRRE, ADAM N) ON 01/08/16 . COSTS OF $ 59.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • OSC HEARING IS SET FOR 11/30/18 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEY . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY DANIEL P RAMIREZ, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR455965067. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less