This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2019 at 13:32:02 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUDNING LLC VS MORELAND, ZURIEL

Case Summary

On 12/16/2016 MIDLAND FUDNING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MORELAND, ZURIEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4311

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUDNING LLC

Defendants

MORELAND ZURIEL AKA MORELAND ZURIEL M

MORELAND ZURIEL AKA MORELAND ZURIE L M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC - DEANNA FRASER

Attorney at MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC

DE GUZMAN NICHOL ALAN S.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

10/2/2017: Request for Dismissal

Disassociation of Attorney

9/12/2017: Disassociation of Attorney

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - Hearing (name extension) scheduled for 12/02/2019 at 08:30 AM in at Department B Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: (MIDLAND FUDNING LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Disassociation of Attorney; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET & ADDENDUM RETURNED NOT FOUND/NO SERVICE AS TO (MORELAND, ZURIEL) AKA (MORELAND, ZURIE L M) FILED. COSTS OF $ 68.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • OSC HEARING IS SET FOR 12/02/19 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEY . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY THOMAS D. LONG, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR467231032. Filing Fee: 181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • DECLARATION UNDER BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONS CODE 6322.1 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less