Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/04/2021 at 12:34:27 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. VS ROBERT ESTRADA

Case Summary

On 06/05/2020 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ROBERT ESTRADA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANN H. PARK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4528

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANN H. PARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.

Defendant

ESTRADA ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JIN JULIA JUNG HYO

 

Court Documents

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

11/18/2020: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

11/18/2020: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

11/18/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033

11/18/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/18/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

7/13/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Complaint - Complaint

6/5/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/5/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/5/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/5/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

6/5/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment: Filed By: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 11/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. against Defendant ROBERT ESTRADA on the Complaint filed by MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. on 06/05/2020 for the principal amount of $8,646.23 and costs of $315.90 for a total of $8,962.13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 06/11/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: ROBERT ESTRADA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to CCP 1033; Filed by: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to ROBERT ESTRADA; On the Complaint filed by MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. on 06/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. on 06/05/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC., does 1 THROUGH 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: ROBERT ESTRADA (Defendant); Service Date: 07/10/2020; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 06/11/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ann H. Park in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: ROBERT ESTRADA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: ROBERT ESTRADA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: ROBERT ESTRADA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JIN JULIA JUNG HYO