This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2017 at 09:38:15 (UTC).

MICHAL BEN-SHOSHAN VS VANESSA ELKINS

Case Summary

On 03/23/2017 MICHAL BEN-SHOSHAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against VANESSA ELKINS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2298

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEN-SHOSHAN MICHAL

Los Angeles, CA 90035

Defendants

ELKINS VANESSA

Los Angeles, CA 90019

AUTOMOBILE CLUB OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

5/18/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

7/20/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order of 07/18/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

7/18/2017: Minute Order of 07/18/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

7/18/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

7/18/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

5/30/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

5/25/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

5/18/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

5/18/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Updated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: Result: Result Date: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 07/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 07/18/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/18/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 07/18/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • On the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by Michal Ben-Shoshan on 05/18/2017, Order for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to Automobile Club of Southern California

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Michal Ben-Shoshan against Defendant Vanessa Elkins on the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by Michal Ben-Shoshan on 05/18/2017 for the principal amount of $2,433.00 and costs of $275.00 for a total of $2,708.00.; This judgment results from a motor vehicle accident on a California highway and was caused by the judgment debtor's operation of a motor vehicle. If the judgment is not paid, the judgment creditor may apply to have the judgment debtor's drivers license suspended.; Other: Judgment ordered against defendant: Vanessa Elkins only.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Michal Ben-Shoshan (Plaintiff); As to: Automobile Club of Southern California (Defendant); Service Cost: 200.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 05/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/18/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Michal Ben-Shoshan (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Michal Ben-Shoshan (Plaintiff); As to: Vanessa Elkins (Defendant); Automobile Club of Southern California (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Michal Ben-Shoshan (Plaintiff); As to: Vanessa Elkins (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0011073 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Invoice: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Fee: $5.00; Payment: 5.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0011073 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/18/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/18/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less