Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2018 at 22:20:27 (UTC).

MICHAEL ROBERT GOETZ VS ARRON TURNBULL

Case Summary

On 10/18/2017 MICHAEL ROBERT GOETZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ARRON TURNBULL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0260

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOETZ MICHAEL ROBERT

Long Beach, CA 90802

Defendant

TURNBULL ARRON DBA NATURE'S NEXT BEVERAGES CO

Los Angeles, CA 90019

 

Court Documents

Unknown

11/28/2017: Unknown

(Non-Jury Trial)

11/28/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Unknown

11/17/2017: Unknown

Unknown

11/16/2017: Unknown

E-Filing Payment Due

10/18/2017: E-Filing Payment Due

Unknown

10/18/2017: Unknown

E-Filing Receipt of Documents

10/18/2017: E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 updated: Result Date to 11/28/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Michael Robert Goetz against Defendant Arron Turnbull DBA NATURE'S NEXT BEVERAGES CO on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Michael Robert Goetz on 10/18/2017 for the principal amount of $3,000.00 and costs of $90.00 for a total of $3,090.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Michael Robert Goetz (Plaintiff); As to: Arron Turnbull (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/01/17; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Michael Robert Goetz (Plaintiff); As to: Arron Turnbull (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/01/17; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 90 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/28/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Michael Robert Goetz (Plaintiff); As to: Arron Turnbull (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less