This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/06/2020 at 18:56:03 (UTC).

MICHAEL JOSEPH LEHMAN VS ANDY HERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 11/06/2019 MICHAEL JOSEPH LEHMAN filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against ANDY HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4787

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LEHMAN MICHAEL JOSEPH

Respondent

HERNANDEZ ANDY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KALAJIAN JOHN MARTIN

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award) of 03/11/2020

3/11/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award) of 03/11/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award)

3/11/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award)

Notice (name extension) - Notice notice of ruling

3/17/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice notice of ruling

Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort - Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort

2/6/2020: Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort - Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

1/21/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Summary of the Case - Summary of the Case

1/21/2020: Summary of the Case - Summary of the Case

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration declaration of petitioner in support of court judgment

1/21/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration declaration of petitioner in support of court judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration declaration in support of prejudgment interest and attorney fees

1/21/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration declaration in support of prejudgment interest and attorney fees

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/21/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/31/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/13/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/6/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/6/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Petition

11/6/2019: Summons - Summons on Petition

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

11/6/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award - Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

11/6/2019: Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award - Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

11/6/2019: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketNotice notice of ruling; Filed by: MICHAEL JOSEPH LEHMAN (Petitioner); As to: ANDY HERNANDEZ (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award) of 03/11/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketHearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award scheduled for 03/11/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 03/11/2020; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketDue to Clerical Error, Hearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award scheduled for 03/11/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Clerical Error was rescheduled to 03/11/2020 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketJudgment proposed default judgment by court - Rejected; Submitted by: MICHAEL JOSEPH LEHMAN (Petitioner); As to: ANDY HERNANDEZ (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: MICHAEL JOSEPH LEHMAN (Petitioner); As to: ANDY HERNANDEZ (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketDeclaration declaration in support of prejudgment interest and attorney fees; Filed by: MICHAEL JOSEPH LEHMAN (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketDeclaration declaration of petitioner in support of court judgment; Filed by: MICHAEL JOSEPH LEHMAN (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketDefault entered as to ANDY HERNANDEZ; On the Petition filed by MICHAEL JOSEPH LEHMAN on 11/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: MICHAEL JOSEPH LEHMAN (Petitioner); As to: ANDY HERNANDEZ (Respondent); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/16/2019; Service Cost: 69.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketHearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award scheduled for 03/11/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketPetition to Confirm Arbitration Award; Filed by: MICHAEL JOSEPH LEHMAN (Petitioner); As to: ANDY HERNANDEZ (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MICHAEL JOSEPH LEHMAN (Petitioner); As to: ANDY HERNANDEZ (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketSummons on Petition; Issued and Filed by: MICHAEL JOSEPH LEHMAN (Petitioner); As to: ANDY HERNANDEZ (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STCP04787    Hearing Date: March 11, 2020    Dept: 26

Lehman v. Hernandez, et al.

PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

(CCP § 1285)

*** MATTER WILL BE HEARD AT 10:30 AM, NOT 8:30 A.M.***

TENTATIVE RULING:

Petition of Michael Joseph Lehman to Confirm Arbitration Award is GRANTED. PETITIONER TO FILE A PROPOSED JUDGMENT WITHIN TEN (10) DAYS.

ANALYSIS:

Petitioner Michael Joseph Lehman (“Petitioner”) filed the instant Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award against Respondent Andy Hernandez (“Respondent”) on November 6, 2019. Default was entered against Respondent on December 31, 2016. To date, no opposition has been filed to the Petition.

Legal Standard

Per Code of Civil Procedure section 1285, “Any party to an arbitration in which an award has been made may petition the court to confirm, correct or vacate the award. The petition shall name as respondent all parties to the arbitration and may name as respondents any other persons bound by the arbitration award.”

Per Code of Civil Procedure section 1285.4, “A petition under this chapter shall: (a) Set forth the substance of or have attached a copy of the agreement to arbitrate unless the petitioner denies the existence of such an agreement; (b) Set forth the names of the arbitrator; and (c) Set forth or have attached a copy of the award and the written opinion of the arbitrators, if any.”

Per Code of Civil Procedure section 1286, “If a petition or response under this chapter is duly served and filed, the court shall confirm the award as made, whether rendered in this state or another state, unless in accordance with this chapter it corrects the award and confirms it as corrected, vacates the award or dismisses the proceeding.”

Discussion

Service of the Petition and Notice of Hearing

Code of Civil Procedure, section 1290.4 requires the Petition and Notice of Hearing to be served on Respondents “in the manner provided in the arbitration agreement for the service of such petition and notice” or “[i]f the arbitration agreement does not provide the manner in which such service shall be made . . . [s]ervice within this State shall be made in the manner provided by law for the service of summons in an action.” (Code Civ. Proc., § 1290.4, subds. (a), (b).)

Petitioner filed proof of service demonstrating substitute service of the Petition and Notice of Hearing on Respondent on November 16, 2019. (Proof of Service, filed 12/13/19.) The arbitration agreement does not set forth a manner of service of the Petition and Notice of Hearing. (Pet., Attachment 4(b).) As this service satisfies the requirements for service of a summons, the requirements for service under Code of Civil Procedure, section 1290.4 have been met.

Service of the Arbitration Award (CCP §§ 1283.6, 1288)

Petitioner also demonstrates service of the arbitration award as required by Code of Civil Procedure section 1283.6. No proof of service is attached to the Arbitration Award, but it was served on Respondent in conjunction with the instant Petition. (Pet., Attachment 8(c).) This satisfies the statutory requirements as service of the arbitration award with the Petition is sufficient to overcome any irregularity in service of the Petition by the arbitrator. (Murry v. Civil Service Employees Ins. Co. (1967) 254 Cal.App.2d 796, 799-800.)

Also, under Code of Civil Procedure section 1288, a petition to confirm arbitration must be filed and served no more than four years after the award was served. The Award was issued on January 16, 2019, making the Petition timely filed and served. (Pet., ¶8 and Attachment 8(c).)

Therefore, the Court finds that the requirements of Code of Civil Procedure, sections 1283.6 and 1288 have been satisfied.

Confirmation of the Arbitration Award

An arbitration award is not directly enforceable until it is confirmed by a court and judgment is entered. (CCP § 1287.6; Jones v. Kvistad (1971) 19 Cal.App.3d 836, 840.) The court must confirm the award as made, unless it corrects or vacates the award, or dismisses the proceeding. (CCP § 1286; Valsan Partners Limited Partnership v. Calcor Space Facility, Inc. (1994) 25 Cal.App.4th 809, 818.) Code of Civil Procedure, section 1285.4 states a petition under this chapter shall:

  1. Set forth the substance of or have attached a copy of the agreement to arbitrate unless the petitioner denies the existence of such an agreement.

  2. Set forth the names of the arbitrators.

  3. Set forth or have attached a copy of the award and the written opinion of the arbitrators, if any.

(Code Civ. Proc., § 1285.4.) The Petition complies with the above requirements. It sets forth the nature of the agreement to arbitrate, which is in a swimming pool construction contract. (Pet., Attachment 4(b).) It also sets forth the name of the Arbitrator (Stephen L. Backus, Esq.) and attaches a copy of the Award to the Petition. (Pet., Attachment 8(c).) The Petition demonstrates that on January 16, 2019, the arbitrator issued an award requiring Respondent to reimburse Petitioner $2,295.00. Accordingly, Petitioner has complied with the requirements of Code of Civil Procedure, section 1285.4.

Attorney’s Fees and Costs

To the extent Petitioner requests attorney’s fees and costs according to proof (Pet., ¶10(e)-(f)), those are permitted on a petition to confirm arbitration award. (Code Civ. Proc., § 1293.2; MBNA America Bank, N.A. v. Gorman (2006) 147 Cal.App.4th.Supp. 1, 7.) Petitioner may file a memorandum of costs pursuant to Cal. Rules of Court Rule 3.1700 and a noticed motion for attorney’s fees pursuant to Cal. Rules of Court Rule 3.1702.

Conclusion

Based on the foregoing, the Petition of Michael Joseph Lehman to Confirm Arbitration Award is GRANTED. PETITIONER TO FILE A PROPOSED JUDGMENT WITHIN TEN (10) DAYS.

Moving party to give notice.