This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/15/2018 at 08:07:16 (UTC).

MICHAEL E HANSON, ET AL. VS FRANCISCO TRINIDAD

Case Summary

On 10/19/2017 MICHAEL E HANSON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FRANCISCO TRINIDAD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA MAY J. SANTOS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9422

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA MAY J. SANTOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HANSON MICHAEL E

La Mirada, CA 90638

HANSON JANET D

La Mirada, CA 90638

Defendant

TRINIDAD FRANCISCO DBA FREEDOM GENERAL CONSTRUCTION

Whittier, CA 90605

 

Court Documents

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

10/19/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

10/19/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

10/19/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

12/22/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

1/2/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs

1/2/2018: Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs

Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

1/2/2018: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs

1/2/2018: Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 01/02/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

1/2/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 01/02/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

1/2/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Other - - EXHIBIT RECEIPT

1/5/2018: Other - - EXHIBIT RECEIPT

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

4/25/2018: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

2/6/2018: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil)

3/26/2018: Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2018
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 04/26/2018 ; Status Date changed from 01/02/2018 to 04/26/2018 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Michael E Hanson (Plaintiff); Janet D Hanson (Plaintiff); As to: Francisco Trinidad (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by: Michael E Hanson (Plaintiff); Janet D Hanson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • Other - EXHIBIT RECEIPT; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/02/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 01/02/2018; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 01/02/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Janet D Hanson and Plaintiff Michael E Hanson against Defendant Francisco Trinidad DBA Freedom General Construction on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Michael E Hanson, et al. on 10/19/2017 for the principal amount of $7,450.00 and costs of $125.00 for a total of $7,575.00.; Waived fees and costs in the amount of $75.00, including those incurred after judgment, must be paid directly to the court by Defendant Francisco Trinidad DBA Freedom General Construction. A full or partial satisfaction of judgment will not be entered unless waived fees are paid per Government Code section 68637(b)(1). An Administrative fee of $25.00 must be assessed if the collection process is initiated to collect unpaid fees per Government Code section 68638.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Michael E Hanson (Plaintiff); Janet D Hanson (Plaintiff); As to: Francisco Trinidad (Defendant); Service Cost: 125.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 12/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Michael E Hanson (Plaintiff); Janet D Hanson (Plaintiff); As to: Francisco Trinidad (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Michael E Hanson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Janet D Hanson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Maria May J. Santos in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/02/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less