This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/26/2016 at 09:00:42 (UTC).

MGA INVESTMENTS GROUP VS. GOOLER-HARVEY, JUDITH

Case Summary

On 05/10/2016 MGA INVESTMENTS GROUP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GOOLER-HARVEY, JUDITH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. DODSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2053

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM D. DODSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MGA INVESTMENTS GROUP LLC

Defendant

GOOLER JUDITH SUED AS GOOLER-HARVEY JUDITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ENDLER LAW, APLC - JEFFREY B ENDLER ESQ

Attorney at ENDLER LAW, APLC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2016
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NEA , HON. WILLIAM D. DODSON, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. MATTER CONTINUED FOR COURT TRIAL TO 08/16/16 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NEA . CLERK TO GIVE NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NEA , HON. WILLIAM D. DODSON, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. MATTER CONTINUED FOR COURT TRIAL TO 06/21/16 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NEA . CLERK IS TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • FIRST AMENDED ANSWER OF DEFENDANT(S) (GOOLER, JUDITH) SUED AS (GOOLER-HARVEY, JUDITH) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL ON 06/13/16 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPARTMENT NEA . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • ANSWER FILED OF (GOOLER, JUDITH) SUED AS (GOOLER-HARVEY, JUDITH) , IN PRO PER . RECEIPT # PAS438714004 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN 004.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON 10/03/16 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPARTMENT NEA . .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MGA INVESTMENTS GROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ENDLER JEFFREY B. ESQ.