This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/19/2019 at 01:51:06 (UTC).

MGA INVESTMENTS GROUP, LLC VS. DAVALOS, GUILLERMO

Case Summary

On 09/24/2015 MGA INVESTMENTS GROUP, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DAVALOS, GUILLERMO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7119

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MGA INVESTMENTS GROUP LLC

Defendants

DAVALOS GUILLERMO

G. DAVALOS AND K. DELVES TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ENDLER LAW, APLC - JEFFREY B ENDLER ESQ

Attorney at ENDLER LAW, APLC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2016
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 11/17/16 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 145.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 10/14/15 , FOR (MGA INVESTMENTS GROUP, LLC) , AGAINST (DAVALOS, GUILLERMO) , (G. DAVALOS AND K. DELVES TRUST) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 934 VERDUGO CIRCLE DRIVE, GLENDALE, CA 91206 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. MAILED . RECEIPT # PAID .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (DAVALOS, GUILLERMO) , (G. DAVALOS AND K. DELVES TRUST) ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (G. DAVALOS AND K. DELVES TRUST) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP; DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2015
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (DAVALOS, GUILLERMO) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS,COMPLAINT,UNLAWFUL DETAINER,PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION,CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET,ADDENDUM FILED. SERVED AS TO (DAVALOS, GUILLERMO) . COSTS OF $ 65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS,COMPLAINT,PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET,ADDENDUM AND STATEMENT OF LOCATION FILED. SERVED AS TO (G. DAVALOS AND K. DELVES TRUST) . COSTS OF $ .00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (DAVALOS, GUILLERMO) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP; DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN PAS512008008.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • NOTICE OF HEARING RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE THOSE DOCUMENTS NECESSARY TO BRING THIS CASE TO A FINAL DISPOSITION . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SIGNED AND FILED BY KEVIN C. BRAZILE . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/12/16 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NEA . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MGA INVESTMENTS GROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ENDLER JEFFREY B. ESQ.