This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/23/2020 at 12:36:04 (UTC).

METROPOLITAN MOBILE HOME PARK, L.P., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP VS TAMARA L. WADE

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 METROPOLITAN MOBILE HOME PARK, L P , A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against TAMARA L WADE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VICTOR M. ACEVEDO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1249

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

VICTOR M. ACEVEDO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

METROPOLITAN MOBILE HOME PARK L.P. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP DBA METROPOLITAN ESTATES

Defendant

WADE TAMARA L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEAVER LARRY WAYNE

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Complaint

7/16/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/16/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/16/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/16/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

7/16/2019: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Tamara L. Wade)

7/18/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Tamara L. Wade)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

7/18/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Application for Order to Post - Application for Order to Post

7/31/2019: Application for Order to Post - Application for Order to Post

Proof of Service by Posting - Proof of Service by Posting

8/7/2019: Proof of Service by Posting - Proof of Service by Posting

Proof of Service by Posting - Proof of Service by Posting

8/7/2019: Proof of Service by Posting - Proof of Service by Posting

Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale - Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale

8/21/2019: Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale - Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/21/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

8/21/2019: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Judgment

8/21/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Judgment

Writ of (name extension) - Writ of Execution

8/21/2019: Writ of (name extension) - Writ of Execution

Writ - Return - Writ - Return

9/10/2019: Writ - Return - Writ - Return

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Wholly Satisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: Yes; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Metropolitan Mobile Home Park, L.P., a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff); As to: Tamara L. Wade (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale; Filed by: Metropolitan Mobile Home Park, L.P., a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketJudgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Metropolitan Mobile Home Park, L.P., a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketWrit of Possession; Issued by: Metropolitan Mobile Home Park, L.P., a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff); As to: Tamara L. Wade (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketDefault entered as to Tamara L. Wade; On the Complaint filed by Metropolitan Mobile Home Park, L.P., a California Limited Partnership on 07/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Possession: Name Extension: Possession; Document changed from Writ of Execution to Writ of (name extension); As To Parties changed from Tamara L. Wade (Defendant) to Tamara L. Wade (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff Metropolitan Mobile Home Park, L.P., a California Limited Partnership DBA Metropolitan Estates against Defendant Tamara L. Wade on the Complaint filed by Metropolitan Mobile Home Park, L.P., a California Limited Partnership on 07/16/2019 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is not granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 16600 Orange Avenue Space No 67, Paramount, CA 90723 is granted for plaintiff(s);; The Rental Agreement under which the property is held is hereby cancelled.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by: Metropolitan Mobile Home Park, L.P., a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff); As to: Tamara L. Wade (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/25/2019 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Posting; Filed by: Metropolitan Mobile Home Park, L.P., a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff); Mailing Date: 08/02/2019; Service Cost: 25.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketApplication for Order to Post; Filed by: Metropolitan Mobile Home Park, L.P., a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff); As to: Tamara L. Wade (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 07/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/25/2019 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Victor M. Acevedo in Department 7 Compton Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Metropolitan Mobile Home Park, L.P., a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff); As to: Tamara L. Wade (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Metropolitan Mobile Home Park, L.P., a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff); As to: Tamara L. Wade (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Metropolitan Mobile Home Park, L.P., a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff); As to: Tamara L. Wade (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where METROPOLITAN MOBILE HOME PARK L.P. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP DBA M is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEAVER LARRY WAYNE