This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 01:55:07 (UTC).

METROPOLITAN FINANCE LLC VS YOLISMA NAVA

Case Summary

On 11/21/2018 METROPOLITAN FINANCE LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against YOLISMA NAVA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CAROL ROSE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0395

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

CAROL ROSE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

METROPOLITAN FINANCE LLC DBA UNIVERSAL FINANCIAL COMPANY

1212 E. Las Tunas Dr

San Gabriel, CA 91766

Defendant

NAVA YOLISMA

Whittier, CA 90605

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

7/2/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/02/2019

7/2/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/02/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

7/2/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

4/15/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)]

4/17/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)]

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

4/15/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

2/11/2019: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Postponement] and Notice of Small Claims Reassignment

1/15/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Postponement] and Notice of Small Claims Reassignment

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

11/21/2018: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Notice of Postponement - Notice of Postponement

12/26/2018: Notice of Postponement - Notice of Postponement

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

11/21/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

11/21/2018: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

11/21/2018: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 1 at 10025 East Flower Street, Bellflower, CA 90706; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Metropolitan Finance LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/02/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/02/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 09/13/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/15/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 07/02/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Metropolitan Finance LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Yolisma Nava (Defendant); Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 01/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/26/2018
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/15/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 04/15/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of Postponement; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name): Name Extension: (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/15/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Carol Rose in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Metropolitan Finance LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Yolisma Nava (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where METROPOLITAN FINANCE LLC DBA UNIVERSAL FINANCIAL COMPANY is a litigant