This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/27/2016 at 08:13:32 (UTC).

MESA PROPERTY, VS HENRY JR., ELMER

Case Summary

On 12/11/2012 MESA PROPERTY filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HENRY JR , ELMER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, San Pedro Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1186

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Pedro Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MESA PROPERTY

Defendants

HENRY JR. ELMER

HENRY PATRICIA A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZACK, GERALD LEE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2013
  • RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • FAILURE TO APPEAR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2013
  • DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS AFTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2013
  • NON-JURY TRIAL CONCLUDED - CAUSE SUBMITTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2013
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2013
  • NON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 03/07/13, 08:30 AM, DEPT 88

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED- 2 HR(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2013
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2013
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2013
  • A/C - ANSWER FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2013
  • A/C - FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2013
  • A/C - FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING SUBMITTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2013
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING SIGNED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2012
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2012
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.