Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/19/2018 at 00:24:20 (UTC).

MERRICK BANK CORPORATION VS YVETTE L PERRY

Case Summary

On 10/18/2017 MERRICK BANK CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against YVETTE L PERRY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICK BROWN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7059

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICK BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERRICK BANK CORPORATION

Defendant

PERRY YVETTE L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACOBSEN DEVIN B.

 

Court Documents

Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

1/19/2018: Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/19/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Default Judgment

1/24/2018: Default Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/15/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - on Complaint

10/18/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/18/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/18/2017: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/18/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant

10/18/2017: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2018
  • Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: Clerk; County: LOS ANGELES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Document Number changed from POS100 - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) to POS160 - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 10/18/2018 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • Default judgment entered for Plaintiff MERRICK BANK CORPORATION against Defendant YVETTE L PERRY on the Complaint filed by MERRICK BANK CORPORATION on 10/18/2017 for the principal amount of $1,127.75 and costs of $284.50 for a total of $1,412.25.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • Default Judgment; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: MERRICK BANK CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: YVETTE L PERRY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • Default entered as to YVETTE L PERRY; On the Complaint filed by MERRICK BANK CORPORATION on 10/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by: MERRICK BANK CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: YVETTE L PERRY (Defendant); Mailing Date: 11/13/2017; Service Cost: 59.50; Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Rick Brown in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 10/18/2018 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by: MERRICK BANK CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: YVETTE L PERRY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MERRICK BANK CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • The case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Merrick Bank Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JACOBSEN, DEVIN