Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/11/2019 at 00:03:27 (UTC).

MERRICK BANK CORPORATION VS DIAZ, DANIEL

Case Summary

On 07/19/2017 MERRICK BANK CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DIAZ, DANIEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5486

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERRICK BANK CORPORATION

Defendant

DIAZ DANIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HUNT & HENRIQUES - JAIME RITTON

Attorney at HUNT & HENRIQUES

RITTON JAIME

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service - No Service

8/16/2017: Proof of Service - No Service

Request for Dismissal

11/22/2017: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - Hearing Other scheduled for 07/06/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: (MERRICK BANK CORPORATION) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Proof of Service - No Service; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • OSC HEARING IS SET FOR 07/06/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEB . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY THOMAS D. LONG, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR455371106. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Merrick Bank Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RITTON, JAIME Y.