This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 20:24:44 (UTC).

MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY VS MOISES ABRAHAM MARTINEZ

Case Summary

On 11/30/2018 MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MOISES ABRAHAM MARTINEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4449

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

MARTINEZ MOISES ABRAHAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPLINTER ROBERT GEORGE

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

3/27/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/15/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Complaint - Complaint

11/30/2018: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/30/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/30/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/30/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

11/30/2018: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/29/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Mercury Insurance Company on 11/30/2018, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Mercury Insurance Company as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Moises Abraham Martinez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Moises Abraham Martinez (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/07/2019; Service Cost: 99.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Moises Abraham Martinez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/29/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SPLINTER ROBERT GEORGE