This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/14/2021 at 07:58:23 (UTC).

MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY VS HUGO RAMOS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/27/2020 MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HUGO RAMOS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0806

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

SOLARES RAUL

ALEXIS TRUCKING INC. DBA ALEXIS TRUCKING

RAMOS HUGO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THAI MIN NHU

 

Court Documents

Judgment - Judgment [Proposed] Judgment After Non-Jury Trial

8/24/2021: Judgment - Judgment [Proposed] Judgment After Non-Jury Trial

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

8/27/2021: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Memorandum of Costs (Summary) - Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

7/28/2021: Memorandum of Costs (Summary) - Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted)

5/25/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted)

Exhibit List - Exhibit List

7/19/2021: Exhibit List - Exhibit List

Witness List - Witness List

7/19/2021: Witness List - Witness List

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of 07/26/2021

7/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of 07/26/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

7/26/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

4/8/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/8/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

4/8/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

4/8/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/27/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/27/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/27/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

1/27/2020: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

1/27/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/27/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2023
  • Hearing01/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketNotice Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by: Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Hugo Ramos (Defendant); Alexis Trucking, Inc. (Defendant); Raul Solares (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 08/24/2021 ; Costs: 459.00 ; Status Date changed from 07/26/2021 to 08/24/2021 ; Costs TBD: blank ; Other Information changed from Attorney Fees and Costs pursuant to a Noticed Motion to Attorney Fees pursuant to a Noticed Motion Any credit on one judgment shall apply to all judgments in this case. ; Status changed from Not Entered (pending submission of proposed judgment) to Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment After Non-Jury Trial: Status Date changed from 08/24/2021 to 08/24/2021; Name Extension changed from [Proposed] Judgment After Non-Jury Trial to After Non-Jury Trial; Result Date changed from 08/24/2021 to 08/24/2021; As To Parties changed from Raul Solares (Defendant), Alexis Trucking, Inc. (Defendant), Hugo Ramos (Defendant) to Hugo Ramos (Defendant), Alexis Trucking, Inc. (Defendant), Raul Solares (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment [Proposed] Judgment After Non-Jury Trial: Filed By: Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 08/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by: Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Hugo Ramos (Defendant); Alexis Trucking, Inc. (Defendant); Raul Solares (Defendant); Total Costs: 459.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketJudgment is to be entered for Plaintiff Mercury Insurance Company against Defendant Hugo Ramos, Defendant Alexis Trucking, Inc. DBA Alexis Trucking and Defendant Raul Solares on the Complaint filed by Mercury Insurance Company on 01/27/2020 for the principal amount of $4,595.48 for a total of $4,595.48, joint and several.; Other: Attorney Fees and Costs pursuant to a Noticed Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of 07/26/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Raul Solares (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Hugo Ramos (Defendant); Alexis Trucking, Inc. (Defendant); Raul Solares (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Hugo Ramos (Defendant); Alexis Trucking, Inc. (Defendant); Raul Solares (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Hugo Ramos (Defendant); Alexis Trucking, Inc. (Defendant); Raul Solares (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Hugo Ramos (Defendant); Alexis Trucking, Inc. (Defendant); Raul Solares (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/26/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STLC00806    Hearing Date: May 25, 2021    Dept: 26

Mercury Ins. Co. v. Ramos, et al

MOTION TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION ADMITTED

(CCP § 2033.280)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Mercury Insurance Company’s Motion to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted Against Defendant Raul Solares is GRANTED.

ANALYSIS:

On January 13, 2021, Plaintiff Mercury Insurance Company (“Plaintiff”) served Requests for Admissions on Defendant Raul Solares (“Defendant Solares”). (Motion, Thai Decl., Exh. 1.) Despite meet and confer efforts, Plaintiff has not received any verified responses to the discovery requests from Defendant Solares to date. (Id. at ¶¶4-6 and Exh. 2.) Plaintiff filed the instant Motion to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted and Request for Sanctions on April 27, 2021. To date, no opposition has been filed.

As of the filing of this Motion, Defendant Solares has not served verified responses to the discovery propounded on January 13, 2021. There is no requirement for a prior meet and confer effort before a motion to deem requests for admission can be filed. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2033.280.) Further, the motion can be brought any time after the responding party fails to provide the responses. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2033.280.) Therefore, Plaintiff is entitled to an order deeming the Requests for Admission admitted. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2033.280.)

Based on the foregoing, Plaintiff Mercury Insurance Company’s Motion to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted Against Defendant Raul Solares is GRANTED.

Moving party to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALEXIS TRUCKING is a litigant

Latest cases where MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THAI MIN NHU