Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2018 at 22:18:38 (UTC).

M.E.R. ENTERPRISES INC VS SINGH, KARNIL DBA DISCOUNT CIT

Case Summary

On 03/28/2012 M E R ENTERPRISES INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SINGH, KARNIL DBA DISCOUNT CIT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT HARRISON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2880

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT HARRISON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

M.E.R. ENTERPRISES INC

M. E. R. ENTERPRISES INC

Defendants

SINGH KARNIL DBA DISCOUNT CITI A DIVISION OF BABA TRADING INC

SINGH SAHIL DBA DISCOUNT CITI A DIVISION OF BABA TRADING INC

BABA TRADING INC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2012
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (BABA TRADING INC) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2012
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 090 , HON. ROBERT HARRISON, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . DEFENDANT APPEARING .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2012
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (M.E.R. ENTERPRISES INC) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2012
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 05/01/12 . FOR (M.E.R. ENTERPRISES INC) . AGAINST (BABA TRADING INC) . PRINCIPAL $ 5000.00 . COSTS $ 120.00 . TOTAL $ 5120.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS. DEFENDANT KARNIL SINGH IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE (WRONG PARTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AS TO (SINGH, KARNIL) DBA (DISCOUNT CITI A) (DIVISION OF BABA TRADING INC) FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 05/01/12 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPARTMENT 090 . SERVICE COSTS: $ 35.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2012
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN LAC205564015. HEARING SET FOR 05/01/12 AT 08:30 AM IN DPT. 090.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BABA TRADING INC is a litigant