This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2019 at 18:27:09 (UTC).

MELANIE DURAN VS DESAREA GOMEZ

Case Summary

On 03/01/2018 MELANIE DURAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DESAREA GOMEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3374

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DURAN MELANIE

Defendant

GOMEZ DESAREA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAGON KALEIGH LEANNE

Defendant Attorney

THAMMALAIVIROJ PATTY

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial and All Trial Related Dates

7/19/2019: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial and All Trial Related Dates

Notice of Related Case - Notice of Related Case

8/13/2019: Notice of Related Case - Notice of Related Case

Proof of Personal Service

9/13/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/19/2018: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

9/19/2018: Answer

Summons - on Complaint

3/1/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/1/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/1/2018: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/1/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2021
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by: Desarea Gomez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order to Continue Trial and All Trial Related Dates; Signed and Filed by: Melanie Duran (Plaintiff); As to: Desarea Gomez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/29/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 10/17/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Desarea Gomez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Melanie Duran (Plaintiff); As to: Desarea Gomez (Defendant); Service Date: 08/23/2018; Service Cost: 45.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Georgina T. Rizk in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/29/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Melanie Duran (Plaintiff); As to: Desarea Gomez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Melanie Duran (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: 18STLC03374 Hearing Date: September 1, 2021 Dept: 26

Duran v. Gomez, et al. 18STLC03374

MOTION TO BE\r\nRELIEVED AS COUNSEL

\r\n\r\n

(CCP § 284(2); CRC\r\nRule 3.1362)

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

TENTATIVE RULING

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Motion of Samantha Larsen, Esq., of\r\nthe Law Office of Eric. K. Chen, to be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff\r\nMelanie Duran is GRANTED. A PROPOSED ORDER HAS BEEN SUBMITTED. RULING TO BE\r\nEFFECTIVE UPON FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE DEMONTRATING SERVICE OF SIGNED AND\r\nCORRECTED ORDER UPON ALL PARTIES.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Moving party to give notice to client and all parties.

'