Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/10/2016 at 11:05:03 (UTC).

MEILOON IMPERIAL VS. PALACIOS, VICTOR MANUEL

Case Summary

On 07/28/2016 MEILOON IMPERIAL filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against PALACIOS, VICTOR MANUEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. DODSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3432

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM D. DODSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEILOON IMPERIAL LLC

Defendants

PALACIOS VICTOR JR.

PALACIOS VICTOR MANUEL

PALACIOS VICTORIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRENNAN LAW FIRM - MICHAEL A. BRENNAN ESQ

Attorney at BRENNAN LAW FIRM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2016
  • NOTICE OF RULING FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL ON 10/13/16 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPARTMENT NEA . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • ANSWER FILED OF (PALACIOS, VICTORIA) PRO PER . RECEIPT # FEE WAIVER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF FILED BY (MEILOON IMPERIAL), LLC .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. NEA , HON. WILLIAM D. DODSON, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: (PALACIOS, VICTORIA) DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT. DEMURRER OVERRULED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP; DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (MEILOON IMPERIAL), LLC FOR REJECTION OF DEFAULT- NAMED DEFENDANT FILED A DEMURRER ON 8/2/16. DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO VICTOR M. PALACIOS AND VICTOR PALACIOS JR. ONLY SUBMITTED ON 08/04/16

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (PALACIOS, VICTORIA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (PALACIOS, VICTOR MANUEL) , (PALACIOS, VICTOR) JR. . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY (PALACIOS, VICTORIA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES SIGNED AND FILED AS TO (PALACIOS, VICTORIA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT AND P & A'S IN SUPPORT THEREOF FILED BY (PALACIOS, VICTORIA) . MATTER NOTICED FOR HEARING ON 09/13/16 AT 01:30P M IN DEPT. NEA . RECEIPT # FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN PAS512985006.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON 01/25/17 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPARTMENT NEA . .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEILOON IMPERIAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRENNAN MICHAEL . A