This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2019 at 01:28:31 (UTC).

MEILOON IMPERIAL VS. DUNCAN, DEIRDRA

Case Summary

On 11/25/2015 MEILOON IMPERIAL filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DUNCAN, DEIRDRA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNABELLE G. CORTEZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8215

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNABELLE G. CORTEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEILOON IMPERIAL LLC

Defendant

DUNCAN DEIRDRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRENNAN LAW FIRM - MICHAEL A. BRENNAN ESQ

Attorney at BRENNAN LAW FIRM

Other Attorneys

BRENNAN MICHAEL ANTHONY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2018
  • Writ of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk; County: Los Angeles; Principal: 8,351.01; Interest: 0.00; Costs: 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: MEILOON IMPERIAL LLC (Plaintiff); As to: DEIRDRA DUNCAN (Defendant); Costs: 375.00; Interest: 0.00; Credits: 0.00; Service Date: 06/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • On the Complaint filed by MEILOON IMPERIAL LLC on 11/25/2015, Default entered on 05/09/2018, Vacated - Clerical Correction.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • Default judgment entered for Plaintiff MEILOON IMPERIAL LLC against Defendant DEIRDRA DUNCAN on the Complaint filed by MEILOON IMPERIAL LLC on 11/25/2015 for past rent due in the amount of $5,250.00, holdover damages $1,850.29, attorney fees of $755.72, and costs of $495.00 for a total of $8,351.01.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Does: 1 to 10 Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: MEILOON IMPERIAL LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/03/2016 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Annabelle G. Cortez in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP; DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN PAS512985016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • NOTICE OF HEARING RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE THOSE DOCUMENTS NECESSARY TO BRING THIS CASE TO A FINAL DISPOSITION . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SIGNED AND FILED BY KEVIN C. BRAZILE . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 05/20/16 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NEA . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by: MEILOON IMPERIAL LLC (Plaintiff); As to: DEIRDRA DUNCAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2015
  • Summons on Complaint; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEILOON IMPERIAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRENNAN MICHAEL . A