Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/16/2019 at 21:14:58 (UTC).

MEILOON IMPERIAL LLC VS MIA D GARRETT

Case Summary

On 04/09/2019 MEILOON IMPERIAL LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MIA D GARRETT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. DODSON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1031

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM D. DODSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEILOON IMPERIAL LLC

Defendant

GARRETT MIA D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRENNAN MICHAEL A.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/9/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

4/9/2019: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Complaint - Complaint

4/9/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/9/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

4/10/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Mia D Garrett)

4/10/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Mia D Garrett)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

4/18/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Answer - Answer

4/18/2019: Answer - Answer

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

4/23/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial - Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial

4/23/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial - Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial

Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial - Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

4/23/2019: Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial - Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/30/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Unlawful Detainer Stipulation and Judgment - Unlawful Detainer Stipulation and Judgment

5/6/2019: Unlawful Detainer Stipulation and Judgment - Unlawful Detainer Stipulation and Judgment

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

5/6/2019: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

5/6/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order - Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

5/6/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order - Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Writ of (name extension) - Writ of WRIT OF POSSESSION

5/8/2019: Writ of (name extension) - Writ of WRIT OF POSSESSION

RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL

6/5/2019: RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Filed by: As to: Mia D Garrett (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by: Meiloon Imperial LLC (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 48.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketWrit of WRIT OF POSSESSION; Issued by: Meiloon Imperial LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Mia D Garrett (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketStipulated judgment entered for Plaintiff Meiloon Imperial LLC against Defendant Mia D Garrett on the Complaint filed by Meiloon Imperial LLC on 04/09/2019 for past rent due in the amount of $3,100.00, holdover damages $1,490.00, attorney fees of $500.00, and costs of $390.00 for a total of $5,480.00.; Judgment for possession is granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 1165 E. MAPLE ST., #3, PASADENA, CA 91106 is granted for plaintiff(s);; The Rental Agreement under which the property is held is hereby cancelled.; Lease Agreement under which the property is held is hereby forfeited.; Writ to issue forthwith, but no lockout prior to 06/01/2019.; See written stipulation for further terms and conditions.; Written stipulation filed and copy of stipulation given/mailed to each party.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Stipulation and Judgment; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Mia D Garrett (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketJudgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/06/2019 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department R updated: Result Date to 05/06/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Meiloon Imperial LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Mia D Garrett (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Mia D Garrett (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/18/2019 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Meiloon Imperial LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Mia D Garrett (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Meiloon Imperial LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Mia D Garrett (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Meiloon Imperial LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Mia D Garrett (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William D. Dodson in Department R Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEILOON IMPERIAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRENNAN MICHAEL . A