This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/23/2018 at 04:47:00 (UTC).

MEILON IMPERIAL, LLC VS MIGUEL RODALES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/09/2018 MEILON IMPERIAL, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MIGUEL RODALES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNABELLE G. CORTEZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2517

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNABELLE G. CORTEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEILON IMPERIAL LLC

Defendants

GARCIA ANABEL

Pasadena, CA 91106

RODALES MIGUEL

Pasadena, CA 91106

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRENNAN MICHAEL ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/9/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/9/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ANABEL GARCIA)

8/10/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ANABEL GARCIA)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (MIGUEL RODALES)

8/10/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (MIGUEL RODALES)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

8/10/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

8/20/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Answer

8/20/2018: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

8/22/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/22/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/22/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

8/24/2018: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial

8/24/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial

Judgment Unlawful Detainer

9/17/2018: Judgment Unlawful Detainer

Order - SEALING RECORDS

9/17/2018: Order - SEALING RECORDS

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

9/17/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge

9/18/2018: Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge

Application for Writ of Possession

9/19/2018: Application for Writ of Possession

Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

9/21/2018: Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2018
  • Writ of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • Application for Writ of Possession; Filed by: MEILON IMPERIAL, LLC (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 46.84

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/17/2018 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department R updated: Result Date to 09/17/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Stipulated judgment entered for Plaintiff MEILON IMPERIAL, LLC against Defendant ANABEL GARCIA and Defendant MIGUEL RODALES on the Complaint filed by MEILON IMPERIAL, LLC on 08/09/2018 for past rent due in the amount of $2,660.00, holdover damages $4,275.00, attorney fees of $500.00, and costs of $370.00 for a total of $7,805.00.; Judgment for possession is granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 1165 E MAPLE ST., #1, Pasadena, CA 91106 is granted for plaintiff(s);; The Rental Agreement under which the property is held is hereby cancelled.; Lease Agreement under which the property is held is hereby forfeited.; Writ to issue forthwith, but no lockout prior to 11/01/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • The case has been sealed pursuant to: Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Unlawful Detainer Stipulation and Judgment; Filed by: Clerk; As to: MIGUEL RODALES (Defendant); ANABEL GARCIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 08/16/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: ANABEL GARCIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • Answer; Filed by: ANABEL GARCIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Notice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 08/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by: MEILON IMPERIAL, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: MIGUEL RODALES (Defendant); ANABEL GARCIA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MEILON IMPERIAL, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Annabelle G. Cortez in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/18/2018 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEILOON IMPERIAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRENNAN MICHAEL . A