This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2019 at 12:35:32 (UTC).

MEHDI AGHAMOHAMMAD VS ARIAN BARZINPOUR

Case Summary

On 01/23/2018 a Property - Other Real Property case was filed by MEHDI AGHAMOHAMMAD against ARIAN BARZINPOUR in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1182

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AGHAMOHAMMAD MEHDI DBA M.A. CONSTRUCTION

Defendants

BARZINPOUR ARIAN

MEGA CAPITAL FUNDING INC

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

7/23/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

3/26/2018: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/24/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice (name extension) - of filing Sheriff's proofs of service of summons and complaint

5/24/2018: Notice (name extension) - of filing Sheriff's proofs of service of summons and complaint

Proof of Personal Service

5/24/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/24/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

5/31/2018: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

2/9/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Lis Pendens

1/31/2018: Notice of Lis Pendens

Summons - on Complaint

1/23/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/23/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/23/2018: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/23/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2021
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/30/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/23/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 08/30/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Mehdi Aghamohammad (Plaintiff); As to: Mega Capital Funding Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketDefault entered as to Mega Capital Funding Inc; On the Complaint filed by Mehdi Aghamohammad on 01/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketNotice of filing Sheriff's proofs of service of summons and complaint; Filed by: Mehdi Aghamohammad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Mehdi Aghamohammad (Plaintiff); As to: Mega Capital Funding Inc (Defendant); Service Date: 04/12/18; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Mehdi Aghamohammad (Plaintiff); As to: Arian Barzinpour (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by: Mehdi Aghamohammad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: Name Extension changed from on Complaint to on Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Mehdi Aghamohammad (Plaintiff); As to: Arian Barzinpour (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Mehdi Aghamohammad (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine Lu in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/23/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/26/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

8102/6¢/G

MAY 24 2018

Telephone: (818] 889=2930 Sh

erri . Facsimile: (818) 889-2930 s IR. ne,fixzugve Officer/Cleri FfaanSCO Caf(‘.'era Depmy

Attorney for Plaintiftf,

MEHDI AGHAMOHAMMAD

dba M.A. CONSTRUCTION LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT -- LIMITED JURISDICTION,

CENTRAL DISTRICT, STANLEY MOSK COURTHOUSE

MEHDI AGHAMOHAMMAD individually Case No. 18STLC01182 and doing business as M.A.

CONSTRUCTION, ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 77 BlaifnE1iret,

NOTICE OF FILING SHERIFF'S PROOFS

VS. OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

ARIAN BARZINPOUR, an individual; and DOES 1 to 15, Inclusive,

DEFENDANT MEGA CAPITAL FUNDING INC SUED HEREIN AS DOE 1

Defendants. ACTION FILED: January 23, 2018

) AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT UPON

) TRIAL DATE: July 23, 2019

PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that the Sheriff's two original Proofs of Service of Summons and Complaint served upon Defendant MEGA CAPITAL FUNDING INC., a California corporation, suedabove-entitled action are being filed herewith. True and correct copies of both executed Proofs of Service are attached hereto and

incorporated herein by this reference.