This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/16/2018 at 08:51:19 (UTC).

MCREF VERDUGO LLC VS ELIZER VARIAS

Case Summary

On 09/22/2017 MCREF VERDUGO LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ELIZER VARIAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. DODSON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1038

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM D. DODSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCREF VERDUGO LLC

Defendant

VARIAS ELIZER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHANG RACHEL YUN

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/22/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - on Complaint

9/22/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Application for Order to Post

10/6/2017: Application for Order to Post

Request for Dismissal

12/14/2017: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/14/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

1/2/2018: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

1/5/2018: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

1/5/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

1/5/2018: Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Proof of Service by Posting

11/6/2017: Proof of Service by Posting

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/6/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

11/6/2017: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/22/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

9/22/2017: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

9/22/2017: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Elizer Varias)

9/22/2017: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Elizer Varias)

Complaint

9/22/2017: Complaint

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketDefault judgment entered for Plaintiff MCREF Verdugo LLC against Defendant Elizer Varias on the Complaint filed by MCREF Verdugo LLC on 09/22/2017 for past rent due in the amount of $2,017.00, holdover damages $2,958.12, attorney fees of $388.50, and costs of $295.00 for a total of $5,658.62.; Other: Possession is not an issue.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketJudgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Does: 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketDefault Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service: Location changed from Civil Clerk's Office to Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: MCREF Verdugo LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: MCREF Verdugo LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by MCREF Verdugo LLC on 09/22/2017, Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to , Does 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: MCREF Verdugo LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Elizer Varias (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • DocketDefault entered as to Elizer Varias; On the Complaint filed by MCREF Verdugo LLC on 09/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/06/2017
  • DocketDefault judgment entered for Plaintiff MCREF Verdugo LLC against Defendant Elizer Varias on the Complaint filed by MCREF Verdugo LLC on 09/22/2017 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is not granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 600 North Central Avenue, #501, Glendale, CA 91203 is granted for plaintiff(s);; The Rental Agreement under which the property is held is not cancelled.; Lease Agreement under which the property is held is not forfeited.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketApplication for Order to Post; Signed and Filed by: MCREF Verdugo LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William D. Dodson in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketOSC - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/04/2017 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 09/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: MCREF Verdugo LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Elizer Varias (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MCREF Verdugo LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MCREF Verdugo LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHANG RACHEL YUN