Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/10/2017 at 10:30:21 (UTC).

MCM INTEGRATED SYSTEMS, INC. VS TORRES CONSTRUCTION CORP.

Case Summary

On 06/15/2017 MCM INTEGRATED SYSTEMS, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TORRES CONSTRUCTION CORP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENJI MACHIDA. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5585

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KENJI MACHIDA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCM INTEGRATED SYSTEMS INC.

6961 Hayvenhurst Avenue,

Van Nuys, CA 91406

Defendant

TORRES CONSTRUCTION CORP.

7330 N Figueroa Street,

Los Angeles, CA 90041

 

Court Documents

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/31/2017

7/31/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/31/2017

(Non-Jury Trial)

7/31/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

6/15/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/31/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/31/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A updated: Result Date to 07/31/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: MCM Integrated Systems, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Torres Construction Corp. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: ST-2017-0015020 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • Invoice: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Fee: $3.00; Payment: 3.00 Receipt: ST-2017-0015020 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Kenji Machida at Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/31/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TORRES CONSTRUCTION CORP. A CALIF. CORP. is a litigant