This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/13/2020 at 22:57:10 (UTC).

MATTHEW VARGAS VS JUSTINA KOHMAN

Case Summary

On 09/12/2019 MATTHEW VARGAS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JUSTINA KOHMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CAROL ROSE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4643

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

CAROL ROSE

 

Party Details

Defendant

KOHMAN JUSTINA

Not Classified By Court

NORIEGA EVANGELINA

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/12/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

9/17/2019: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

10/21/2019: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

11/18/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

11/18/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/18/2019, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

11/18/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/18/2019, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

11/18/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Pay Judgment to Court]

11/25/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Pay Judgment to Court]

Request to Pay Judgment to Court - Request to Pay Judgment to Court

11/25/2019: Request to Pay Judgment to Court - Request to Pay Judgment to Court

Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court - Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court

12/26/2019: Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court - Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court

Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds - Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds

1/13/2020: Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds - Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketJudgment Creditor's Request for Funds; Filed by: Matthew Vargas (Plaintiff); Evangelina Noriega (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketSatisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 12/26/2019 ; Status Date changed from 11/18/2019 to 12/26/2019 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketRequest to Pay Judgment to Court; Filed by: Justina Kohman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Request to Pay Judgment to Court]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/18/2019, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/18/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 11/18/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Matthew Vargas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Matthew Vargas, by and through Guardian Ad Litem against Defendant Justina Kohman on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Matthew Vargas on 09/12/2019 for the principal amount of $1,500.00 and costs of $160.00 for a total of $1,660.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Matthew Vargas (Plaintiff); As to: Justina Kohman (Defendant); Service Cost: 85.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 10/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by: Evangelina Noriega (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Justina Kohman (Defendant) to Justina Kohman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Justina Kohman (Defendant) to Justina Kohman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/18/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Carol Rose in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Matthew Vargas (Plaintiff); As to: Justina Kohman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less