Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/28/2020 at 15:37:56 (UTC).

MASAYOSHI KIRIHARA VS KATHY KEELY

Case Summary

On 07/12/2017 MASAYOSHI KIRIHARA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KATHY KEELY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD FRANK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5239

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KIRIHARA MASAYOSHI

Rancho Palos Verdes, CA 90275

Defendant

KEELY KATHY

Torrance, CA 90501

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

12/28/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

12/28/2017: Minute Order - (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/28/2017

12/28/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/28/2017

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

12/28/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

12/28/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

9/13/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling

9/22/2017: Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

8/31/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

8/31/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

7/12/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court), Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court, Request to Waive Court Fees]

7/18/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court), Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court, Request to Waive Court Fees]

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

7/12/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/28/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/28/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 12/28/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by MASAYOSHI KIRIHARA on 07/12/2017 as follows: Defendant KATHY KEELY does not owe the plaintiff MASAYOSHI KIRIHARA any money on plaintiff's claim.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketMinute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Relocation Rescheduling; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/19/2017 at 01:30 PM in at Department 8 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 12/28/2017 08:30 AM at 12/28/2017 8:30 AM Non-Jury Trial in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: MASAYOSHI KIRIHARA (Plaintiff); As to: KATHY KEELY (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 09/06/17

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/31/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 08/31/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/19/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: MASAYOSHI KIRIHARA (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • DocketInvoice: Small Claims <= $1,500: Filing for $1,500 or less- CCP 116.230(b)(1); Fee: $30.00; Payment: 30.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0015383 (Waived Court); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/31/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court), Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court, Request to Waive Court Fees]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: MASAYOSHI KIRIHARA (Plaintiff); As to: KATHY KEELY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: MASAYOSHI KIRIHARA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ronald Frank at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court): Result: Granted; Result Date: 07/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less