Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/20/2021 at 02:25:43 (UTC).

MARY STEFFENHAGEN VS JOHN BAILEY

Case Summary

On 11/12/2020 MARY STEFFENHAGEN filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against JOHN BAILEY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3761

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Petitioner

STEFFENHAGEN MARY

Respondent

BAILEY JOHN BAILEY CONSTRUCTION

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Vacate Contractual Arbitration Award)

3/18/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Vacate Contractual Arbitration Award)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition Vacate Contractual Arbitration Award) of 03/18/2021

3/18/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition Vacate Contractual Arbitration Award) of 03/18/2021

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

2/25/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/12/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition (name extension) - Petition Vacate Contractual Arbitration Award

11/12/2020: Petition (name extension) - Petition Vacate Contractual Arbitration Award

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

11/12/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

11/12/2020: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/12/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Petition Vacate Contractual Arbitration Award)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition Vacate Contractual Arbitration Award) of 03/18/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketHearing on Petition Vacate Contractual Arbitration Award scheduled for 03/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 03/18/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Petition Vacate Contractual Arbitration Award: Filed By: Mary Steffenhagen (Petitioner); Result: Denied; Result Date: 03/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Mary Steffenhagen (Petitioner); As to: John Bailey (Respondent); Service Date: 01/27/21; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketHearing on Petition Vacate Contractual Arbitration Award scheduled for 03/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketPetition Vacate Contractual Arbitration Award; Filed by: Mary Steffenhagen (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Mary Steffenhagen (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STCP03761    Hearing Date: March 18, 2021    Dept: 26

Steffenhagen v. Bailey, et al

VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD

(CCP § 1285)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Petitioner Mary Steffenhagen’s Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award is DISMISSED.

ANALYSIS:

On November 12, 2020, Petitioner Mary Steffenhagen (“Petitioner”) filed the instant Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award against Respondent John Bailey dba Bailey Construction (“Respondent”). To date, no response has been filed.

A petition to vacate or correct an arbitration award must be served and filed no later than 100 days after the date of the service of a signed copy of the award on the petitioner. (Code Civ. Proc., § 1288.) The subject arbitration award (“the Award”) was served on July 20, 2020. (Pet., ¶9(b) and Attachment 8(c).) The Petition, however, was not timely filed or served. The Petition was filed on November 12, 2020, 115 days after service of the Award. Furthermore, the Petition was not served until January 27, 2021, or 191 days after service of the Award.

Therefore, the Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award is untimely under Code of Civil Procedure section 1288 and the Court is jurisdictionally barred from granting it. (See Abers v. Rohrs (2013) 217 Cal.App.4th 1199, 1203.)

Conclusion

Petitioner Mary Steffenhagen’s Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award is DISMISSED.

Court clerk to give notice.